No. 22-592
Title:Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security
Docketed:December 27, 2022
Linked with 22A544
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-5325)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2022Application (22A544) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2023)
Dec 19 2022Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants, it is ordered that the November 15, 2022 order of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, case No. 1:21-cv-00100, is hereby stayed pending further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court. It is further ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Tuesday, December 20, 2022, by 5 p.m. (EST).
Dec 20 2022Federal Respondents' Opposition to the Application For A Stay Pending Certiorari filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 20 2022Response to application from respondent Nancy Gimena Huisha-Huisha, et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2022Motion for leave to file and brief of amicus curiae filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Dec 21 2022Reply of applicant Arizona, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Petition GRANTED.
Dec 27 2022Application (22A544) referred to the Court.
Dec 27 2022Application (22A544) for stay pending certiorari presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted. The November 15, 2022 order of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, case No. 1:21– cv–00100, is hereby stayed. Applicants suggested this Court treat the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari; doing so, the petition is granted. The parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether the State applicants may intervene to challenge the District Court’s summary judgment order. This stay precludes giving effect to the District Court order setting aside and vacating the Title 42 policy; the stay itself does not prevent the federal government from taking any action with respect to that policy. The Court’s review on certiorari is limited to the question of intervention. While the underlying merits of the District Court’s summary judgment order are pertinent to that analysis, the Court does not grant review of those merits, which have not yet been addressed by the Court of Appeals. The Clerk is directed to establish a briefing schedule that will allow the case to be argued in the February 2023 argument session. The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The order heretofore entered by The Chief Justice is vacated. Justice Sotomayor and Justice Kagan would deny the application. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Jackson joins, dissenting. (Detached Opinion)
Jan 04 2023The joint appendix and petitioners’ brief on the merits are to be filed on or before Wednesday, January 18, 2023. Respondents’ briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 7, 2023. The reply brief is to be filed on or before Friday, February 17, 2023. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before Friday, January 20, 2023. Amicus curiae briefs in support of respondents are to be filed on or before Thursday, February 9, 2023.
Jan 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 1, 2023.
Jan 06 2023Record requested from U.S.C.A.-D.C. Circuit.
Jan 09 2023The record for the U.S.C.A.-D.C. Circuit is available on PACER.
Jan 09 2023The record for the U.S.D.C.-D.C. is available on PACER.
Jan 18 2023Brief of petitioners Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Ensign Law Group
202 E. Earll Drive
Suite 425
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drewensignlaw@gmail.com
602-542-5025
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Elizabeth B. MurrillOffice of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70804

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
212-549-2616
Party name: Nancy Gimena Huisha-Huisha, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: Mayorkas, Alejandro, et al.
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 608
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLAWKOWSKI@DHILLONLAW.COM
7035741654
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition