No. 22-585
Title:Halima Tariffa Culley, et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General of Alabama, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2022
Linked with 22A428
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13805, 21-13484)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2022Application (22A428) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Application (22A428) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 28, 2022.
Dec 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Waiver of right of respondents Steven T. Marshall, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 03 2023Waiver of right of respondent City of Satsuma to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 03 2023Waiver of right of respondent Town of Leesburg, Alabama to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 17 2023Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023)
Jan 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2023 to March 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 09 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 2, 2023.
Feb 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2023Brief of respondents Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General of Alabama, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023.
Mar 15 2023Reply of petitioners Halima Tariffa Culley, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023Petition GRANTED.
Apr 27 2023Motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 22, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including granted and the time is extended to and including August 14, 2023.
Jun 22 2023Brief of petitioner Halima Tariffa Culley filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Legal Aid Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, Stephanie Wilson and Gerardo Serrano filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Alabama, Cato Institute, and Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute; Pacific Legal Foundation; Manhattan Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed. (July 6, 2023)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2023Brief of respondents Steven T. Marshall, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2023Brief of respondents City of Satsuma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 14 2023Brief of Town of Leesburg, Alabama not accepted for filing.(Dupilicate submission) (August 16, 2023)
Aug 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Wayne County, Michigan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association and National League of Cities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 30, 2023
Sep 06 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit.
Sep 06 2023CIRCULATED.
Sep 07 2023Record from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit available on PACER.
Sep 13 2023Reply of petitioner Halima Tariffa Culley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Record from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama received electronically and available with the Clerk.
Oct 02 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 30 2023Argued. For petitioners: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Edmund G. LaCour, Jr., Solicitor General, Montgomery, Ala.; and Nicole F. Reaves, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
May 09 2024Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kagan and Jackson, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian M. ClarkWiggins, Childs, Fisher, Pantazis, & Goldfarb, LLC
301 19th Street North
Birmingham, AL 35203-3144

BCLARK@WIGGINSCHILDS.COM
(205) 314-0530
Party name: Halima Tariffa Culley
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

SHAY.DVORETZKY@SKADDEN.COM
202-371-7370
Party name: Halima Tariffa Culley
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Octavius Gaillard IIIHelmsing, Leach, Herlong, Newman & Rouse
150 Government Street, Suite 2000
Mobile, AL 36602

tog@helmsinglaw.com
251-342-5521
Party name: City of Satsuma
Howard Edgar HowardFord, Howard & Cornett, P.C.
Post Office Box 388
140 South 9th Street
Gadsden, AL 35902

ed@fordhowardcornett.com
256-546-5432
Party name: Town of Leesburg, Alabama
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: Steven T. Marshall, et al.
Edgar Robert Haden
    Counsel of Record
Balch & Bingham LLP
1901 Sixth Avenue North
Suite 1500
Birmingham, AL 35203

ehaden@balch.com
205-226-8795
Party name: Town of Leesburg, Alabama
Edgar Robert Haden
    Counsel of Record
Balch & Bingham LLP
1901 Sixth Avenue North
Suite 1500
Birmingham, AL 35203

ehaden@balch.com
205-226-8795
Party name: City of Satsuma
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Gilbert Charles Dickey
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy, PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

gilbert@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association and National League of Cities
Gregory James DuBoff
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 E Canal St
Richmond, VA 23219

GDUBOFF@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
8047751154
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Robert Everett Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
16781 Chagrin Blvd. #256
Shaker Heights, OH 44120

rjohnson@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice, Stephanie Wilson and Gerardo Serrano
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLAFETRA@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Elizabeth Gaudio Milito
    Counsel of Record
National Federation of Independent Business Legal
555 12th Street NW
Ste 1001
Washington, DC 20004

elizabeth.milito@nfib.org
(202) 406-4443
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc.
Thomas M. O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
The Legal Aid Society
199 Water Street, 6th Floor
New York, NY 10038

tmobrien@legal-aid.org
2125773551
Party name: The Legal Aid Society
Abram J. Pafford
    Counsel of Record
Appellate Justice Initiative at McGuire Woods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

apafford@mcguirewoods.com
2028571725
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Alabama, Cato Institute, and Rutherford Institute
Stephen John Petrany
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

SPETRANY@LAW.GA.GOV
404-458-3408
Party name: State of Georgia, et al.
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Pacific Legal Foundation; Manhattan Institute
Davidde Alessandro Stella
    Counsel of Record
Wayne County Corporation Counsel
500 Griswold St.
Floor 30
Detroit, MI 48226

dstella@waynecounty.com
3132245030
Party name: Wayne County, Michigan
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

MPS@SUBBLAW.COM
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.