No. 22-583
Title:Evan Greebel, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 23, 2022
Linked with 22A417
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-993)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2022Application (22A417) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2022 to December 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 09 2022Application (22A417) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 22, 2022.
Dec 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 18 2023Response Requested. (Due February 17, 2023)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Akiva Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

ashapiro@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Evan Greebel
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America