No. 22-580 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Kenneth Eugene Smith
Docketed:December 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-13781)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2023Brief of respondent Kenneth Eugene Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert M. Grass
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019

ROBERT.GRASS@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
(212) 836-8000
Party name: Kenneth Eugene Smith