No. 22-58
Title:United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:July 21, 2022
Linked with 22A17
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-40367)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2022Application (22A17) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed.
Jul 08 2022Response to application (22A17) requested by Justice Alito, due 5 p.m. (EDT), July 13, 2022.
Jul 13 2022Response to application from respondents Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Arizona, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Indiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, West Virginia, and Wyoming.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Stephen I. Vladeck.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Jul 14 2022Reply of applicants United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Jul 21 2022Application (22A17) referred to the Court.
Jul 21 2022Application (22A17) denied by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. The Solicitor General suggested that the Court may want to construe the application as a petition for certiorari before judgment. Doing so, the petition is granted. The parties are directed to brief and argue the following questions: 1. Whether the state plaintiffs have Article III standing to challenge the Department of Homeland Security’s Guidelines for the Enforcement of Civil Immigration Law; 2. Whether the Guidelines are contrary to 8 U.S.C. §1226(c) or 8 U.S.C. §1231(a), or otherwise violate the Administrative Procedure Act; and 3. Whether 8 U.S.C. §1252(f)(1) prevents the entry of an order to “hold unlawful and set aside” the Guidelines under 5 U.S.C. §706(2). The case will be set for argument in the first week of the December 2022 argument session. Justice Sotomayor, Justice Kagan, Justice Barrett, and Justice Jackson would grant the application for stay.
Aug 19 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 12, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Texas, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 12 2022Brief of petitioners United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 13 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Immigrant and Civil Rights Organizations, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2022Amicus brief of Stephen I. Vladeck not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted - September 21, 2022).
Sep 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Stephen I. Vladeck filed. (Sept. 23, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 21 Cities, Counties, and Local Government Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Officials of the Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 29, 2022.
Oct 18 2022Brief of respondents Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2022Motion for leave to intervene filed by Sheriff Brad Coe, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Oct 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Florida filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief of Texas Sheriffs and Counties and the Federal Police Foundation, ICE Officers Division, as Movants for Intervention Or, Alternatively, as Amici Curiae in Support of Respondents and Affirmance of Sheriff Brad Coe, et al. not accepted for filing. (October 27, 2022--Corrected brief as amici curiae to be submitted.)
Oct 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas Sheriffs, et al. filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022CIRCULATED.
Oct 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Oct 28 2022Record received from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. The record is available on PACER.
Nov 02 2022Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 03 2022Response in opposition to motion for leave to intervene from petitioners United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 15 2022Reply on motion to intervene of Sheriff Brad Coe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 17 2022Reply of petitioners United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 21 2022Motion for leave to intervene filed by Sheriff Brad Coe, et al. DENIED.
Nov 29 2022Argued. For petitioners: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Other
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: States of Arizona, Alabama, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, Virginia, West Virginia, and Wyoming
Adam Scott Gershenson
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
500 Boylston Street, 14th Floor
Boston, MA 02116

agershenson@cooley.com
(617) 937-2379
Party name: Administrative Law Professors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Former Officials of the Department of Homeland Security and the Immigration and Naturalization Service
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Texas Sheriffs, et al.
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Stephen I. Vladeck
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition, LLC
Charles G. Roth
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Justice Center
224 S. Michigan Ave., Ste. 600
Chicago, IL 60604

croth@heartlandalliance.org
3126601613
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center, American Gateways, API-GBV, Tahirih Justice Center
Sirine Shebaya
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Project (NIPNLG)
2201 Wisconsin Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20007

sirine@nipnlg.org
(202) 656-4788
Party name: Immigrant and Civil Rights Organizations, et al.
Daniel Ramsey Suvor
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 So. Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071

dsuvor@omm.com
213-430-6000
Party name: 21 Cities, Counties, and Local Government Organizations
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, and Washington, and the District of Columbia
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: State of Florida
Cody Hirt Wofsy
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm St.
San Francisco, CA 94111

cwofsy@aclu.org
415-343-0785
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, ACLU of Texas, American Immigration Lawyers Association
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen