No. 22-571
Title:United States and Michigan, ex rel. Mohamad Sy, et al., Petitioners
v.
Oakland Physicians Medical Center, LLC, dba Pontiac General Hospital, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1011)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 19, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shereef Hadi Akeel
    Counsel of Record
Akeel & Valentine, PLC
888 W. Big Beaver Road
Suite 420
Troy, MI 48084

shereef@akeelvalentine.com
248-269-9595
Party name: United States of America and State of Michigan ex rel. Mohamad Sy and Doshaun Edwards