No. 22-566
Vide 22-634
Title:William Yeatman, Petitioner
v.
Kathryn Hyland, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3765, 20-3766)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 7, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2023Brief of respondent Richard Estle Carson III in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2023 to February 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2023, for all respondents.
Jan 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed (also in 22-554). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for American Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

ted.frank@hlli.org
7032033848
Party name: William Yeatman
Attorneys for Respondents
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg Pllc
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Hyland, Garcia, Saint-Paul, Spitler-Lawson, Means, Kaplan, Guth, Nocerino,Taylor and Church
Eric Alan Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231

ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Richard Estle Carson III
Other
Jeremy Lynn Kidd
    Counsel of Record
Drake University Law School
2507 University Ave.
Des Moines, IA 50311

jeremy.kidd@drake.edu
515-271-2068
Party name: Manhattan Institute
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Law, PLLC
7 West 6th Avenue
#518
Helena, MT 59601

DALE@LANDMARKLAWPLLC.COM
4064382163
Party name: Center for American Liberty
Kathleen Lynn Smithgall
    Counsel of Record
Montana Office of the Attorney General
215 N. Sanders St.
Helena, MT 59601

kathleen.smithgall@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana