No. 22-56
Title:101 Houseco, LLC, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10305, 18-10370, 19-10043)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John D. Cline
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John D. Cline
600 Stewart Street
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98101

cline@johndclinelaw.com
360-320-6435
Party name: 101 Houseco, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States