No. 22-558
Title:Pedro Lance Soto, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:December 19, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Tenth District
   Case Numbers:(10-21-00180-CR)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 14, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2023)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 23 2023Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark William Bennett
    Counsel of Record
917 Franklin Street, Fourth Floor
Houston, TX 77002

mb@ivi3.com
7132241747
Party name: Pedro Lance Soto
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrea L. Westerfeld
    Counsel of Record
Ellis County & District Attorney
109 S Jackson
Waxahachie, TX 75165

andrea.westerfeld@co.ellis.tx.us
972-825-5000
Party name: Texas