No. 22-555 | |
Title: | NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al., Petitioners v. Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas |
Docketed: | December 19, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-51178) |
Decision Date: | September 16, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 15 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 20 2022 | Response to petition from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 20 2022 | Letter dated December 20, 2022, from counsel for respondent filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 03 2023 | Reply of petitioners NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 04 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023. |
Jan 23 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
Aug 14 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 28 2023 | Supplemental brief of respondent Angela Colmenero, in her Official Capacity as Provisional Attorney General of Texas filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Aug 30 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioners NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 29 2023 | Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the Solicitor General in her brief for the United States as amicus curiae. |
Oct 10 2023 | The following briefing schedule is adopted: Respondents in No. 22-277 and petitioners in No. 22-555 shall file opening briefs on the merits on or before Thursday, November 30, 2023, and the briefs shall bear a light blue cover. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support or in support of neither party shall be filed on or before Thursday, December 7, 2023, and the brief shall bear a light green cover. Petitioners in No. 22-277 and respondents in No. 22-555 shall file response briefs on the merits on or before Tuesday, January 16, 2024, and those briefs shall bear a light red cover. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support shall be filed on or before Tuesday, January 23, 2024, and the briefs shall bear a dark green cover. Reply briefs shall be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3, and the briefs shall bear a yellow cover. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief in these cases. |
Nov 30 2023 | Amicus brief of Media Law Resource Center, Inc. submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 30 2023 | Brief of NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 30 2023 | Joint Appendix submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Scott A. Keller Counsel of Record | Lehotsky Keller LLP 200 Massachusetts Ave., NW Washington, DC 20001 scott@lehotskykeller.com | (512) 693-8350 |
Party name: NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Lanora Christine Pettit Counsel of Record | Office of the Texas Attorney General P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Angela Colmenero, in her Official Capacity as Provisional Attorney General of Texas | ||
Other | ||
George Freeman Counsel of Record | Media Law Resource Center, Inc. 266 West 37th Street 20th Floor New York, NY 10018 gfreeman@medialaw.org | (212) 337-0200 |
Party name: Media Law Resource Center, Inc. | ||
Jean-Paul Jassy Counsel of Record | Jassy Vick Carolan LLP 355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2450 Los Angeles, CA 90071 jpjassy@jassyvick.com | 310-870-7048 |
Party name: Internet Works, Glassdoor, LLC, Indeed, Inc., Nextdoor, Inc., Mozilla Corporation, Pinterest, Inc., Reddit, Inc. Tripadvisor, LLC, Tumblr, Inc., Vimeo, Inc. | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |