No. 22-554
Title:Anna St. John, Petitioner
v.
Lisa Jones, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2022
Linked with 22A395
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2292)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2022Application (22A395) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2022 to December 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Application (22A395) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 14, 2022.
Dec 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2023Motion or respondents Lisa Jones, et al. to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2023Motion of respondent Monsanto Company to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 05 2023The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2023, for all respondents.
Jan 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed (also in 22-566). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for American Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

ted.frank@hlli.org
7032033848
Party name: Anna St. John
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Lin Baum
    Counsel of Record
Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman
11111 Santa Monica Blvd.
Suite 1750
Los Angeles, CA 90025

mbaum@baumhedlundlaw.com
310-207-3233
Party name: Lisa Jones, Horacio Torres Bonilla, and Kristoffer Yee
Other
Jeremy Lynn Kidd
    Counsel of Record
Drake University Law School
2507 University Ave.
Des Moines, IA 50311

jeremy.kidd@drake.edu
515-271-2068
Party name: Manhattan Institute
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Law, PLLC
7 West 6th Avenue
#518
Helena, MT 59601

dale@landmarklawpllc.com
406-438-2163
Party name: Center for American Liberty
Kathleen Lynn Smithgall
    Counsel of Record
Montana Office of the Attorney General
215 N. Sanders St.
Helena, MT 59601

kathleen.smithgall@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute