No. 22-545
Title:Sage Lewis, et al., Petitioners
v.
Akron Board of Zoning Appeals
Docketed:December 14, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Ohio, Summit County
   Case Numbers:(30075)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 13, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2023 to March 14, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2023.
Jan 10 2023Waiver of right of respondent Akron Board of Zoning Appeals to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 18 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeff Rowes
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jrowes@ij.org
(703) 599-2307
Party name: Sage Lewis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Robert York
    Counsel of Record
Law Dept., Civil Div., Ste.202
161 S. High St.
Suite 202
Akron, OH 44308-1655

jyork@akronohio.gov
(330) 375-2030
Party name: Akron Board of Zoning Appeals