No. 22-534
Title:Theresa Eagleson, Director, Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services, Petitioner
v.
St. Anthony Hospital, et al.
Docketed:December 9, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2325)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 8, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2023Brief of respondent Managed Care Organizations in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Medicaid Health Plans of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 31 2023Response Requested. (Due March 2, 2023)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
Hugh Scott Balsam
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
111 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606-4410

hbalsam@lockelord.com
312-443-0403
Party name: Managed Care Organizations
Michael ShakmanMiller Shakman Levine & Feldman LLP
30 W. Monroe Street, 19th Floor
Chicago, IL 60603

mlshak@aol.com
(312) 263-3700
Party name: St. Anthony Hospital
Other
Stephen David Libowsky
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
151 North Franklin Street
Suite 2600
Chicago, IL 60606

SLibowsky@manatt.com
312-477-4798
Party name: Medicaid Health Plans of America