No. 22-533
Title:Ifrah Yassin, Petitioner
v.
Heather Weyker
Docketed:December 9, 2022
Linked with 22A203
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3299)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2022Application (22A203) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 12, 2022 to December 9, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Application (22A203) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 9, 2022.
Dec 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Amanda Knox filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Ifrah Yassin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Alexa Leann Gervasi
    Counsel of Record
3505 Melwood Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15213

alexagervasi@gmail.com
8063356632
Party name: Amanda Knox