No. 22-531
Title:Alan Wofsy, et al., Petitioners
v.
Vincent Sicre de Fontbrune, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yves Sicre de Fontbrune, et al.
Docketed:December 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16913, 19-17024)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2023Reply of petitioners Alan Wofsy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

npopovic@sheppardmullin.com
415.434.9100
Party name: Alan Wofsy, et al.