No. 22-529 | |
Title: | Alex Cantero, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Petitioners v. Bank of America, N.A. |
Docketed: | December 8, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-400, 21-403) |
Decision Date: | September 15, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 05 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 06 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Bank of America, N.A. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 11 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. |
Jan 17 2023 | Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023) |
Feb 16 2023 | Brief of respondent Bank of America, N.A. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Mar 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 08 2023 | Reply of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 27 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
Aug 30 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Sep 13 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Jonathan Ellis Taylor Counsel of Record | Gupta Wessler PLLC 2001 K Street NW Suite 850 North Washington, DC 20006 jon@guptawessler.com | 2028881741 |
Party name: Alex Cantero, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Mark W. Mosier Counsel of Record | Covington & Burling, LLP One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW Washington, DC 20001 mmosier@cov.com | 202-662-5435 |
Party name: Bank of America, N.A. | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |