No. 22-524
Title:Shell Oil Products Co., L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rhode Island
Docketed:December 6, 2022
Linked with 22A233
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1818)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2022Application (22A233) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 5, 2022 to December 4, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 15 2022Response to application from respondent Rhode Island filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 16 2022Application (22A233) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 4, 2022.
Dec 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Rhode Island
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2023 to February 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 6, 2023.
Dec 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Blanket Consent
Jan 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Energy Policy Advocates filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2023Waiver of right of respondent Saint Anthony Hospital to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Victor M. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Edling LLP
100 Montgomery St.
Suite 1410
San Francisco, CA 94104

vic@sheredling.com
628-231-2500
Party name: Rhode Island
Mary Eileen Cunniff WellsMiller Shakman Levine & Feldman LLP
30 W. Monroe Street, Suite 1900
Chicago, IL 60603

mwells@millershakman.com
312-263-3700
Party name: Saint Anthony Hospital
Other
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Matthew Daniel Hardin
    Counsel of Record
Hardin Law Office
1725 I Street NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

MatthewDHardin@gmail.com
202-802-1948
Party name: Energy Policy Advocates