No. 22-523
Title:Sunoco LP, et al., Petitioners
v.
City and County of Honolulu, Hawaii, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2022
Linked with 22A239
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15313, 21-15318)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2022Application (22A239) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 5, 2022 to December 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Sep 21 2022Application (22A239) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 4, 2022.
Dec 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2022Letter from counsel for petitioners pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2023 to February 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 6, 2023.
Dec 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Sunoco LP
Blanket Consent
Jan 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Sunoco LP
Attorneys for Respondents
Victor M. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Edling LLP
100 Montgomery St.
Suite 1410
San Francisco, CA 94104

vic@sheredling.com
628-231-2500
Party name: City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Other
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-662-4860
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America