No. 22-517
Vide 22-389
Title:Jenna Dickenson, Petitioner
v.
Charles T. Johnson, et al.
Docketed:December 5, 2022
Linked with 22A343
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12344)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2022Application (22A343) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2022 to December 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Application (22A343) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 1, 2022.
Dec 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Charles Johnson to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 18 2023Response Requested. (Due February 17, 2023)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231

ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Jenna Dickenson
Attorneys for Respondents
Ashley Conrad Keller
    Counsel of Record
Keller Postman LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606

ack@kellerpostman.com
3127415222
Party name: Charles Johnson