No. 22-513
Title:Hyrum James Geddes, Petitioner
v.
Weber County, Utah, et al.
Docketed:December 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4083)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 9, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Brief of respondents Weber County, Utah, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2023Reply of petitioner Hyrum Geddes filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory William Stevens
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Gregory W. Stevens
2825 East Cottonwood Parkway, Suite 500
Salt Lake City, UT 84121-7060

utlaw@aol.com
801-990-3388
Party name: Hyrum Geddes
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank D. Mylar
    Counsel of Record
Mylar Law, P.C.
2494 Bengal Blvd.
Salt Lake City, UT 84121

office@mylarlaw.com
8018580700
Party name: Weber County, et al.