No. 22-510
Title:Jody Lombardo, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2022
Linked with 22A220
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1469)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022Application (22A220) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2022 to November 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Sep 13 2022Application (22A220) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 26, 2022.
Nov 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2022Waiver of right of respondents City of St. Louis, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Seth Stoughton filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 09 2023Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2023)
Feb 02 2023Response of Jody Lombardo, et al. to motion submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Ellis Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

jon@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Jody Lombardo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew D. WheatonCity of St. Louis Law Department
1200 Market Street, Room 314
St. Louis, MO 63103-2864

wheatona@stlouis-mo.gov
314-622-3361
Party name: City of St. Louis, et al.
Other
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Amy Mason Saharia
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

asaharia@wc.com
202-434-5847
Party name: Professor Seth Stoughton