No. 22-51
Vide 21-1484
Title:Department of the Interior, et al., Petitioners
v.
Navajo Nation, et al.
Docketed:July 19, 2022
Linked with 21A704
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17088)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2022Application (21A704) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2022 to June 17, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2022Application (21A704) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 17, 2022.
Jun 07 2022Application (21A704) to extend further the time from June 17, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Application (21A704) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 15, 2022.
Jul 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2022)
Proof of ServicePetition
Jul 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 18, 2022 to September 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 23, 2022, for all respondents.
Sep 23 2022Brief of respondents Navajo Nation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief in support of petition from respondent Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 13 2022Reply of petitioners Department of the Interior, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 21-1484 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Nov 04 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-1484. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-1484. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Interior, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Navajo Nation
Rita Pearson Maguire
    Counsel of Record
Rita P. Maguire, Attorney at Law, PLLC
P.O. Box 60702
Phoenix, AZ 85082

rmaguire@azwaterlaw.com
602-277-2197
Party name: State of Arizona, State of Nevada, State of Colorado, The Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, et al.