No. 22-501
Title:Tom Alonzo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Scott Schwab, Kansas Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:November 29, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(125,092)
   Decision Date:June 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2022)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Scott Schwab, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 16 2022Response Requested. (Due January 17, 2023)
Dec 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Peter Gaber
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

mgaber@campaignlegal.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Tom Alonzo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Dwight Rlyn Carswell
    Counsel of Record
Kansas Attorney General's Office
120 SW 10th Ave., 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

dwight.carswell@ag.ks.gov
(785) 296-2215
Party name: Scott Schwab, et al.