No. 22-500
Title:Great Lakes Insurance SE, Petitioner
v.
Raiders Retreat Realty Co., LLC
Docketed:November 30, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1562)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent Raiders Retreat Realty Co., LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 09 2022Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2023)
Jan 06 2023Brief of respondent Raiders Retreat Realty Co., LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2023Reply of petitioner Great Lakes Insurance SE filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023.
Mar 06 2023Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Mar 24 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 26, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 31, 2023.
May 12 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Great Lakes Insurance SE.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 25 2023Amicus brief of New England Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2023Brief of petitioner Great Lakes Insurance SE filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 31 2023Amicus brief of Professors John F. Coyle and Kermit Roosevelt III submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Isaac GoldmanThe Goldman Maritime Law Group
233 Harvard Street
Suite 211
Brookline, MA 02446

MICHAEL@GOLDMANMARITIME.COM
(617) 566-4200
Party name: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
1700 New York Ave NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

wallj@sullcrom.com
(202) 956-7660
Party name: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Attorneys for Respondent
Howard Jonathan Bashman
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Howard J. Bashman
500 Office Center Drive
Suite 400
Fort Washington, PA 19034

hjb@hjbashman.com
2158301458
Party name: Raiders Retreat Realty Co., LLC
Other
F. Andrew Hessick
    Counsel of Record
160 Ridge Road
Chapel Hill, NC 27599

AHESSICK@EMAIL.UNC.EDU
(919) 962-4332
Party name: Professors John F. Coyle and Kermit Roosevelt III
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
333 Washington Street
suite 850
Boston, MA 02108

brobbins@newenglandlegal.org
6176953660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation