No. 22-497
Title:Jasper Robin Chen, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:November 28, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(PD-0096-21, PD-0097-21)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2022Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 06 2023Response Requested. (Due February 6, 2023)
Jan 27 2023Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lane Andrew Haygood
    Counsel of Record
Bailey & Galyen
3800 E. 42nd Street
Ste 110
Odessa, TX 79762

lhaygood@galyen.com
4328035800
Party name: Jasper Chen
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

JUDD.STONE@OAG.TEXAS.GOV
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas
Patricia McLeanHarris County District Attorney's Office
1201 Franklin Street, 6th Floor
Houston, TX 77002

McLean_Patricia@dao.hctx.net
713-274-5826
Party name: Texas