No. 22-495
Title:Chevron Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
San Mateo County, California, et al.
Docketed:November 28, 2022
Linked with 22A196
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15499, 18-15502, 18-15503, 18-16376)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 26 2022Application (22A196) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 25, 2022 to November 24, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Application (22A196) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 24, 2022.
Aug 31 2022Response to application from respondent San Mateo County, CA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2022 to January 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2023.
Dec 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, County of San Mateo, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Chevron Corporation, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2023Brief of respondents County of San Mateo, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Chevron Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Victor M. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Edling LLP
100 Montgomery St.
Suite 1410
San Francisco, CA 94104

vic@sheredling.com
628-231-2500
Party name: County of San Mateo, et al.
Other
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-662-4860
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers