No. 22-490 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Lydell Chestnut, Deputy Warden, Petitioner
v.
Quincy J. Allen
Docketed:November 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2022 to January 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 23, 2023.
Jan 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 23, 2023 to February 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 22, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melody Jane Brown
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-6305
Party name: Lydell Chestnut
Attorneys for Respondent
Aren Adjoian
    Counsel of Record
Federal Community Defender Office, E.D. Pa.
Curtis Center, Suite 545-W
601 Walnut St.
Philadelphia, PA 19106

aren_adjoian@fd.org
215-928-0520
Party name: Quincy Allen
Other
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation