No. 22-49
Title:Efrain Lora, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 19, 2022
Linked with 21A693
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-33)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 05 2022Application (21A693) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 09 2022Application (21A693) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 15, 2022.
Jul 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 27 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Jul 29 2022Response Requested. (Due August 29, 2022)
Aug 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2022 to September 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 28, 2022.
Sep 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2022 to October 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 28, 2022.
Oct 28 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2022Reply of petitioner Efrain Lora filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.
Nov 29 2022Waiver of right of respondent Las Vegas Police Protective Association Metro, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Efrain Lora
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Kimberley C. WeberMcCraken, Stemerman & Holsberry, LLP
475 14th Street, Suite 1200
Oakland, CA 94612

kweber@msh.law
415-597-7200
Party name: Las Vegas Police Protective Association Metro, Inc.