No. 22-488
Title:Darrell Hemphill, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:November 22, 2022
Linked with 22A260
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(82 SSM 12)
   Decision Date:July 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2022Application (22A260) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 19, 2022 to November 18, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 26 2022Application (22A260) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 18, 2022.
Nov 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2022Waiver of right of respondent New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 08 2022Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2023)
Dec 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Darrell Hemphill
Blanket Consent
Dec 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 9, 2023 to February 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 8, 2023.
Jan 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of The National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2023Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Project and Innocence Network filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2023 to March 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 1, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Darrell Hemphill
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Arnold Andersen
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Bronx County District Attorney
198 East 161st Street
Bronx, NY 10451

andersenp@bronxda.nyc.gov
718 838 6667
Party name: State of New York
Other
James Connolly Dugan
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
212-728-8000
Party name: The Innocence Project and Innocence Network
Thomas W. Hillier II
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie, LLP
1201 Third Ave., Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

THillier@perkinscoie.com
206-359-6328
Party name: The National Association for Public Defense
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers