No. 22-484
Title:Pedro Pierluisi, Governor of Puerto Rico, et al., Petitioners
v.
Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Docketed:November 22, 2022
Linked with 22A223
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1071)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022Application (22A223) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2022 to November 19, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 13 2022Application (22A223) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 19, 2022.
Nov 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 22, 2022 to February 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2023. See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William J. Sushon
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

wsushon@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Honorable Pedro Pierluisi, in his official capacity, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: The Financial Oversight and Management Board