No. 22-481
Title:Daphne Moore, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 22, 2022
Linked with 22A224
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1583, 19-1626)
   Decision Date:June 9, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 23, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022Application (22A224) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 21, 2022 to November 20, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 14 2022Application (22A224) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 20, 2022.
Nov 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 22, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 15 2022Response Requested. (Due January 17, 2023)
Dec 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of Muslim Public Affairs Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2023.
Jan 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2023 to March 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 15, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nathan Freed Wessler
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

nwessler@aclu.org
212-519-7847
Party name: Daphne Moore
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al.
Joshua Craig McDaniel
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Religious Freedom Clinic
6 Everett St
Suite 5110
Cambridge, MA 02138

jmcdaniel@law.harvard.edu
6174964383
Party name: Muslim Public Affairs Council
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Joshua Aaron Windham
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jwindham@ij.org
7047121490
Party name: Institute for Justice