No. 22-474
Title:Laddie Huffman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rachel Harris
Docketed:November 18, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-60456)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Waiver of right of respondent Rachel Harris to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 22 2022Response Requested. (Due January 23, 2023)
Dec 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 23, 2023 to March 14, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 28 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner Laddie Huffman, et al. filed.
Main Document
Dec 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Philip Wade Savrin
    Counsel of Record
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
100 Galleria Parkway
Suite 1600
Atlanta, GA 30339

psavrin@fmglaw.com
770-818-1405
Party name: Laddie Huffman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-661-6728
Party name: Rachel Harris