No. 22-472
Title:Association des Éleveurs de Cananards et D'oies du Quebéc, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Docketed:November 18, 2022
Linked with 22A242
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55882, 20-55944)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 1, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2022Application (22A242) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 29, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 20 2022Application (22A242) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 14, 2022.
Nov 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2022 to February 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2023.
Dec 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Republic of France filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Reason Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Poultry & Egg Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Conseil de la Transformation Alimentaire du Québec filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2023Brief of Rob Bonta in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
The Office of Michael Tenenbaum, Esq.
1431 Ocean Avenue, Ste. 900
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2144

mt@post.harvard.edu
(424) 246-8685
Party name: Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Rob Bonta
Other
Eric Samuel Boorstin
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy, LLP
3601 W. Olive Avenue, 8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505

eboorstin@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Republic of France
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th St. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

mfrancisco@mcguirewoods.com
202-857-1722
Party name: U.S. Poultry & Egg Association
Manuel S. Klausner
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Manuel S. Klausner
5538 Red Oak Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90068

mklausner@klausnerlaw.us
213-675-1776
Party name: Reason Foundation and Manhattan Institute for Policy Research
Daniel E. Sobelsohn
    Counsel of Record
The Sobelsohn Law Firm
16027 Ventura Blvd.
Suite 502
Encino, CA 91436

dsobelsohn@sobelsohnlaw.com
3107750504
Party name: Conseil de la Transformation Alimentaire du Québec