No. 22-47
Title:Kerry Benninghoff, Individually and as Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Petitioner
v.
2021 Legislative Reapportionment Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 18, 2022
Linked with 21A798
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(11 MM 2022)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2022Application (21A798) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2022 to August 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Application (21A798) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 14, 2022.
Jul 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2022 to September 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Efrem M. Braden
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1504
Party name: Kerry Benninghoff, individually, and as Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel T. Brier
    Counsel of Record
Myers, Brier, Kelly
Suite 200
425 Biden Street
Scranton, PA 18503

dbrier@mbklaw.com
5703426100
Party name: Joanna E. McClinton
Robert L. Byer
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
625 Liberty Avenue
Suite 1000
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: 2021 Legislative Reapportionment Commission