No. 22-464
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Saleem Hakim
Docketed:November 16, 2022
Linked with 22A275
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11970)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 15, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 29 2022Application (22A275) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 13, 2022 to November 12, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 30 2022Application (22A275) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 14, 2022.
Nov 03 2022Application (22A275) to extend further the time from November 14, 2022 to December 12, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Application (22A275) denied by Justice Thomas.
Nov 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2022)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2022 to January 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2022.
Jan 17 2023Brief of respondent Saleem Hakim in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2023Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Traci L. Lovitt
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

tlovitt@jonesday.com
(212) 326-3939
Party name: Saleem Hakim