No. 22-456 | |
Title: | Lynett S. Wilson, Petitioner v. Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs, et al. |
Docketed: | November 15, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1498) |
Decision Date: | June 14, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 24, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 09 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2022 to January 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2023. |
Dec 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2023. |
Feb 16 2023 | Brief of respondents Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 06 2023 | Reply of petitioner Lynett S. Wilson filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 27 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Timothy Tutt Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer 601 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com | 202-942-5000 |
Party name: Lynett S. Wilson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: McDonough, Denis Richard, et al. |