No. 22-455
Title:Tyson Foods, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rolandette Glenn, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-40622, 21-11110)
   Decision Date:July 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent Rolandette Glenn, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 15 2022Response Requested. (Due January 17, 2023)
Jan 17 2023Brief of respondents Rolandette Glenn, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 01 2023Reply of Tyson Foods, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Tyson Foods, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Gould
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Itkin, LLP
6009 Memorial Drive
Houston, TX 77007

agould@arnolditkin.com
7132223800
Party name: Rolandette Glenn, et al.