No. 22-451 | |
Title: | Loper Bright Enterprises, et al., Petitioners v. Gina Raimondo, Secretary of Commerce, et al. |
Docketed: | November 15, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-5166) |
Decision Date: | August 12, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 10 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 17 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. |
Blanket Consent | |
Dec 06 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 09 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 12 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 13 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2022 to January 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 14 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2023. |
Dec 15 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Employers Alliance. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Relentless, Inc., et al. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by David Goethel, et al. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion of Advancing American Freedom for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing.(Duplicate submission) (December 20, 2022) |
Dec 15 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Advancing American Freedom, et al.(12/19/2022) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2023. |
Feb 16 2023 | Brief of respondents Gina Raimondo, Secretary of Commerce, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 08 2023 | Reply of petitioners Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023. |
Apr 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. |
Apr 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. |
Apr 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Employers Alliance GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Relentless, Inc., et al. GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by David Goethel, et al. GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Advancing American Freedom GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
May 01 2023 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Clement & Murphy, PLLC 706 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 paul.clement@clementmurphy.com | (202) 742-8900 |
Party name: Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Raimondo, Gina, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Matthew S. Bowman Counsel of Record | Alliance Defending Freedom 440 First Street, NW Suite 600 Washington, DC 20001 mbowman@adflegal.org | 202-393-8690 |
Party name: Christian Employers Alliance | ||
Anthony Thomas Caso Counsel of Record | Constitutional Counsel Group 174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620 Anaheim, CA 92805 atcaso@ccg1776.com | 916-601-1916 |
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence | ||
Aditya Dynar Counsel of Record | Pacific Legal Foundation 3100 Clarendon Blvd. Ste. 1000 Arlington, VA 22201 ADynar@pacificlegal.org | (202) 807-4472 |
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation | ||
Andrew Michael Grossman Counsel of Record | Baker & Hostetler LLP 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. Suite 1100 Washington, DC 20036 agrossman@bakerlaw.com | 2028611697 |
Party name: David Goethel and John Haran | ||
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Boulevard Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 tom@consovoymccarthy.com | 7032439423 |
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation | ||
Clark M. Neily III Counsel of Record | Cato Institute 1000 Mass. Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 cneily@cato.org | 2024257499 |
Party name: Cato Institute | ||
John Joseph Park Jr. Counsel of Record | Law Offices of Jack Park P.O. Box 3073 Gainesville, GA 30503 jackparklaw@gmail.com | 678-608-1920 |
Party name: The Buckeye Institute and National Federation of Independent Business | ||
Benjamin G. Robbins Counsel of Record | New England Legal Foundation 333 Washington Street suite 850 Boston, MA 02108 brobbins@newenglandlegal.org | 6176953660 |
Party name: New England Legal Foundation | ||
Lindsay Sara See Counsel of Record | Office of the West Virginia Attorney General State Capitol Complex Building 1, Room E-26 Charleston, WV 25305 lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov | 3045582021 |
Party name: State of West Virginia and 17 Other States | ||
Kathryn Elizabeth Tarbert Counsel of Record | Schaerr Jaffe LLP 1717 K Street NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 ktarbert@schaerr-jaffe.com | 2027871060 |
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center | ||
John Julian Vecchione Counsel of Record | The New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th St. NW Suite 450 Washington, DC 20036-2411 john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com | 2028695210 |
Party name: Relentless, Inc., Huntress Inc., SeaFreeze Fleet LLC | ||
Charles Devin Watkins Counsel of Record | Competitive Enterprise Institute 1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor Washington, DC 20005 devin.watkins@cei.org | 202-331-1010 |
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute and Manhattan Institute | ||
John Marc Wheat Counsel of Record | Advancing American Freedom, Inc. 801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 930 Washington, DC 20004-2729 mwheat@advancingamericanfreedom.com | (202) 780-4848 |
Party name: Advancing American Freedom | ||
William James Young Counsel of Record | c/o National Right to Work Legal Def. Fdtn., Inc. 8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600 Springfield, VA 22160 wjy@nrtw.org | (703) 321-8510 |
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. |