No. 22-450
Title:Gregory Shields, Sr., Petitioner
v.
Kentucky
Docketed:November 15, 2022
Linked with 22A198
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2020-SC-0060-MR)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2022Application (22A198) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 14, 2022 to November 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Application (22A198) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 11, 2022.
Nov 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kentucky to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Richard D. Friedman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of VanHo Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 27 2022Response Requested. (Due January 26, 2023)
Jan 26 2023Brief of respondent Kentucky in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: Gregory Shields
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

matt.kuhn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Kentucky
Other
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

steven.engel@dechert.com
2022613369
Party name: Rutherford Institute
Richard D. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
625 South State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

rdfrdman@umich.edu
734 647 1078
Party name: Richard D. Friedman
Adam Michael Van Ho
    Counsel of Record
VanHo Law
37 South Main Street
Suite 3
Munroe Falls, OH 44262

adam@vanholaw.com
3306538511
Party name: VanHo Law