No. 22-448 | |
Title: | Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al., Petitioners v. Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. |
Docketed: | November 14, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-50826) |
Decision Date: | October 19, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2022) |
Certificate of Word CountPetition | |
Nov 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 21 2022 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2023. |
Dec 14 2022 | Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 14 2022 | Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 13 2023 | Brief of respondents Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. |
Feb 01 2023 | Reply of petitioner Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 21 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023. |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
Mar 10 2023 | Motion for an extension of time filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 8, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 3, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Noel John Francisco Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 njfrancisco@jonesday.com | (202) 879-3939 |
Party name: Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Lindsay Sara See Counsel of Record | Office of the West Virginia Attorney General State Capitol Complex Building 1, Room E-26 Charleston, WV 25305 lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov | 3045582021 |
Party name: State of West Virginia and 15 Other States | ||
Barbara Dale Underwood Counsel of Record | Solicitor General Office of the Attorney General 28 Liberty Street New York, NY 10005-1400 Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov | 212-416-8016 |
Party name: States of New York, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaiʻi, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Washington, and Wisconsin, and the District of Columbia |