No. 22-447
Title:Johnson & Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
California
Docketed:November 15, 2022
Linked with 22A256
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fourth Appellate District, Division One
   Case Numbers:(D077945)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 13, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 19 2022Application (22A256) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2022 to November 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Application (22A256) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 10, 2022.
Nov 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2022 to January 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2023. See Rule 30.1.
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Advanced Medical Technology Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2023Reply of petitioners Johnson & Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Johnson & Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: State of California
Other
Elizabeth Holt Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 800
San Francisco, CA 94111-4057

elizabeth.andrews@troutman.com
415-477-5700
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-662-4860
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Robert M. Palumbos
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmpalumbos@duanemorris.com
215-979-1111
Party name: Advanced Medical Technology Association
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America