No. 22-438 | |
Title: | Glow In One Mini Golf, L.L.C., et al., Petitioners v. Tim Walz, Governor of Minnesota, et al. |
Docketed: | November 10, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-2283) |
Decision Date: | June 16, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 9, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 07 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | |
Nov 29 2022 | Waiver of right of respondents Governor Tim Walz, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 12 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
James Vincent Francis Dickey Counsel of Record | Upper Midwest Law Center 8421 Wayzata Blvd., Suite 300 Golden Valley, MN 55426 james.dickey@umwlc.org | 612-428-7002 |
Party name: Glow In One Mini Golf, L.L.C., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer Counsel of Record | Office of the Minnesota Attorney General 445 Minnesota Street Suite 1100 Saint Paul, MN 55101 liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us | 6517571010 |
Party name: Governor Tim Walz, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Jay Remington Schweikert Counsel of Record | The Cato Institute 1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 jschweikert@cato.org | 2022161461 |
Party name: Cato Institute & Manhattan Institute |