No. 22-436 | |
Title: | Xiaojie He, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | November 10, 2022 |
Linked with 22A151 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1328) |
Decision Date: | February 4, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 7, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 16 2022 | Application (22A151) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 5, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Aug 16 2022 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Aug 18 2022 | Application (22A151) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 4, 2022. |
Nov 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2022) |
Nov 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 12, 2022 to January 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Nov 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 11, 2023. |
Dec 12 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of American Gateways filed. |
Jan 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 11, 2023 to February 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Jan 04 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 10, 2023. |
Jan 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2023 to March 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Feb 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 17, 2023. |
Mar 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 17, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Nadia Anguiano-Wehde Counsel of Record | James H. Binger Center for New Americans 229 19th Avenue South 190 Mondale Hall Minneapolis, MN 55455 angui010@umn.edu | (612) 625-5515 |
Party name: Xiaojie He | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General | ||
Other | ||
Ethan James Nutter Counsel of Record | Vinson & Elkins LLP 200 West 6th Street, Suite 2500 Austin, TX 78701 enutter@velaw.com | 5125428555 |
Party name: American Gateways |