No. 22-434
Title:Slade Alan Moore, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:November 9, 2022
Linked with 22A219
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Eighth District
   Case Numbers:(08-20-00064-CR)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 22, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2022Application (22A219) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2022 to October 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 13 2022Application (22A219) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 6, 2022.
Sep 26 2022Application (22A219) to extend further the time from October 6, 2022 to November 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 05 2022Application (22A219) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 7, 2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lane Andrew Haygood
    Counsel of Record
Bailey & Galyen
3800 E 42nd St
Ste 110
Odessa, TX 79762

lhaygood@galyen.com
4327034822
Party name: Slade Moore
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas