No. 22-431
Title:Gigi Jordan, Petitioner
v.
Amy Lamanna, Superintendent, Bedford Hills Correctional Facility
Docketed:November 8, 2022
Linked with 22A38
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3317)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 9, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2022Application (22A38) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 7, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 20 2022Application (22A38) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 4, 2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Gigi Jordan