No. 22-430
Title:Charles Barton, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:November 8, 2022
Linked with 22A138
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(PD-1123-19)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2022
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 08 2022Application (22A138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Application (22A138) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 6, 2022.
Aug 30 2022Application (22A207) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2022 to October 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 08 2022Application (22A207) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 6, 2022.
Sep 23 2022Application (22A207) to extend further the time from October 6, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 23 2022Application (22A138) to extend further the time from October 6, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 28 2022Application (22A207) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 4, 2022.
Sep 28 2022Application (22A138) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 4, 2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2023.
Nov 17 2022Motion of Texas for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Schulz
    Counsel of Record
Media Freedom and Information Access Clinic
Abrams Institute, Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

david.schulz@yale.edu
(203) 436-5827
Party name: Charles Barton and Nathan Sanders
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas