No. 22-429 | |
Title: | Acheson Hotels, LLC, Petitioner v. Deborah Laufer |
Docketed: | November 8, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1410) |
Decision Date: | October 5, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2022) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 07 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Deborah Laufer to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 08 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Restaurant Law Center, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 08 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 08 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 08 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Responsibility filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 08 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
Dec 19 2022 | Response Requested. (Due January 18, 2023) |
Jan 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2023 to February 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 17, 2023. |
Feb 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including February 27, 2023. |
Feb 24 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Feb 24 2023 | Brief of respondent Deborah Laufer in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 28 2023 | Reply of petitioner Acheson Hotels, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. |
Mar 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 27 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam G. Unikowsky Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 AUnikowsky@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Acheson Hotels, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Thomas Burns Bacon Counsel of Record | Thomas B. Bacon, P.A. 1317 Edgewater Drive Suite 556 Orlando, FL 32804 TBB@THOMASBACONLAW.COM | 9544787811 |
Party name: Deborah Laufer | ||
Kelsi Brown Corkran | Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection 600 New Jersey Ave NW Washington, DC 20001 KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU | 202-661-6728 |
Party name: Deborah Laufer | ||
Other | ||
Dylan Bradley Carp Counsel of Record | Jackson Lewis P.C. 50 California Street 9th Floor San Francisco, CA 94111 dylan.carp@jacksonlewis.com | 415-394-9400 |
Party name: Restaurant Law Center | ||
Shay Dvoretzky Counsel of Record | Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP 1440 New York Ave., NW Washington, DC 20005 shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com | 202-371-7370 |
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., and National Retail Federation | ||
Steven Paul Lehotsky Counsel of Record | Lehotsky Keller LLP 200 Massachusetts Avenue NW Washington, DC 20001 steve@lehotskykeller.com | 5126938350 |
Party name: Center for Constitutional Responsibility | ||
Mark Andrew Perry Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP 2001 M Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 mark.perry@weil.com | (202) 682-7000 |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Resort Development Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, and International Council of Shopping Centers | ||
Sarah Elizabeth Spencer Counsel of Record | Christensen & Jensen 257 East 200 South, Suite 1100 Suite 800 Salt Lake City, UT 84111 sarah.spencer@chrisjen.com | 8013235000 |
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy |