No. 22-425 | |
Title: | Robin Carnahan, Administrator of the General Services Administration, Petitioner v. Carolyn Maloney, et al. |
Docketed: | November 7, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-5305) |
Decision Date: | December 29, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 8, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2022) |
PetitionCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2022 to January 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2023. |
Dec 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2023 to February 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 6, 2023. |
Feb 06 2023 | Brief of respondents Carolyn Maloney, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. |
Feb 22 2023 | Reply of petitioner Robin Carnahan, Administrator of the General Services Administrator filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Robin Carnahan, Administrator of the General Services Administrator | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
David C. Vladeck Counsel of Record | Georgetown Law 600 New Jersey Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 vladeckd@georgetown.edu | 202-662-9540 |
Party name: Maloney | ||
Scott Lawrence Nelson | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 SNELSON@CITIZEN.ORG | 202-588-1000 |
Party name: Maloney et al. |