No. 22-42
Title:Dipendra Tiwari, et al., Petitioners
v.
Eric Friedlander, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, et al.
Docketed:July 14, 2022
Linked with 21A615
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-5495)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2022Application (21A615) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to July 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Application (21A615) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 14, 2022.
Jul 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 14, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Heller Ward
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

andrew.ward@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Dipendra Tiwari, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David Thomas Lovely
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky
275 East Main Street, 5WB
Frankfort, KY 40621

davidt.lovely@ky.gov
8593510642
Party name: Eric Friedlander, et al.
Other
David Michael Dirr
    Counsel of Record
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle psc
109 East Fourth Street
Covington, KY 41011

ddirr@dbllaw.com
8593411881
Party name: Kentucky Hospital Association