No. 22-419
Title:Cedric Chanu, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 4, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2242, 21-2251, 21-2666)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Michael Katz
    Counsel of Record
Aaron Katz Law LLC
399 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02116

akatz@aaronkatzlaw.com
617-915-6305
Party name: Cedric Chanu
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States